Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sandra L. Sargent, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Martin-Grande, Diane Marie, against Evan D. Sargent, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts with Bernadette T Clark presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBernadette T Clark Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2022 | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | ||
October 05, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
September 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 19, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
September 19, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
August 26, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
August 26, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
August 26, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
August 26, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.