Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Edward Francis Haynes, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Entelisano, Bruce C., against Denein Renee Haynes, represented by Hobika, Joseph Habib, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts with Scott Del Conte presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott Del Conte Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
June 24, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
June 23, 2022 | CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL - SETTLED - PACKET FOR JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
June 13, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 03, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
April 04, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 15, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
February 14, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 07, 2022 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
January 24, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.