Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Five Star Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Mcandrew, John Kevin, against Carmen V.F. Wahl, Steven A. Greene, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 11, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of investigator and military pulls |
||
November 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 11, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of additional mailing - Steven A. Greene |
||
November 11, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Aff of additional mailing - Carmen V. F. Wahl |
||
November 01, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED |
||
September 23, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 27, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.