Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
James Wilton, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Belluck, Joseph Warren, Dymond, Seth A, Macrides, Michael Alexander, against Abb, Inc., Formerly Known As Brown Boveri, Abb, Inc., Formerly Known As Brown Boveri, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, As Successor By Merger To Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, As Successor By Merger To Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Allen-Bradley Company, Inc., Individually And As Successor To Rostone, (total of 103) See All represented by Abbot, Edward Pierce, Brauer Ruchala, Heidi Kay, Brownstein, Boris, Burgasser, Jessica Jean, Burns, Amanda Brooke, (total of 55) See All in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts with Erin P Gall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErin P Gall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Bw Ip International Co., Formerly Known As Borg Warner Industrial Products Inc., A Former Subsidiary Of And Successor To Borg Warner Corp. And Byron Jackson Pumps
Bw Ip International Co., Formerly Known As Borg Warner Industrial Products Inc., A Former Subsidiary Of And Successor To Borg Warner Corp. And Byron Jackson Pumps
Cbs Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, F K A Viacom Inc, Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation, A Pennsylvania Corporation, F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Cbs Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, F K A Viacom Inc, Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation, A Pennsylvania Corporation, F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Individually And As Successor To Tappan And Copes-Vulcan, Blaw-Knox Company And White Consolidated Industries
Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Individually And As Successor To Tappan And Copes-Vulcan, Blaw-Knox Company And White Consolidated Industries
Flowserve Us, Inc., Solely As Successor To Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. And Edward Vogt Valve Company
Flowserve Us, Inc., Solely As Successor To Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. And Edward Vogt Valve Company
Fmc Corporation, Individually And As Successor To Northern Pump Company, Coffin And Peerless Pump Company And Labour Pump Company
Fmc Corporation, Individually And As Successor To Northern Pump Company, Coffin And Peerless Pump Company And Labour Pump Company
Gould Electronics, Inc., Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To I-T-E Imperial Corporation And I-T-E Circuit Breaker Company
Honeywell International, Inc., Ndividually And F K A Alliedsignal, Inc., And As Successor-In-Interest To The Bendix Corp.
Honeywell International, Inc., Ndividually And F K A Alliedsignal, Inc., And As Successor-In-Interest To The Bendix Corp.
Howden Buffalo, Inc., Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To Fb Sturtevant, The Howden Buffalo Group And Buffalo Fan
Howden Buffalo, Inc., Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To Fb Sturtevant, The Howden Buffalo Group And Buffalo Fan
Riley Power, Inc. F K A Babcock Borsig Power, Inc. And F K A Riley-Stoker Corporation D B A Db Riley, Inc.
Riley Power, Inc. F K A Babcock Borsig Power, Inc. And F K A Riley-Stoker Corporation D B A Db Riley, Inc.
Siemens Industry, Inc., Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc
Signify North America Corporation, Individually And As Successor To Genlyte Thomas Group Llc And Lightolier Genlyte Thomas Group, Llc, Individually And As Successor To Lightolier
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 04, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 04, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) CBS Stip of Discontinuance w/prej |
||
May 26, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #45) Notice of Motion for Executed NOSJM for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation |
||
May 26, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #45) Executed NOSJM for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation |
||
May 11, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
April 21, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Mack Trucks, Inc. |
||
February 15, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #34) On behalf of Armstong International, Inc. |
||
January 23, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE - Genuine Parts Company |
||
January 19, 2023 |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #44) AS TO GENUINE PARTS COMPANY |
||
January 17, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT EATON CORPORATION, ONLY |
||
January 09, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Executed Stipulation of Discontinuance for Defendant Eaton Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.