Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Faxton St. Lukes Healthcare, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Leonard Stone, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 21, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
September 02, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT J |
||
September 01, 2021 | Affidavit of Additional Mailing | ||
September 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 21, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.