Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Kim E Knoeller, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts with Louis P Gigliotti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLouis P Gigliotti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 22, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 10, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) AOS FOR LETTER OF ADJOURNMENT |
||
January 19, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 06, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #01) AOS WITH LETTER TO DEFT ON ADJOURNMENT |
||
January 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 16, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 16, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
September 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #01) summons |
||
September 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #01) answer |
||
September 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.