Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Faxton St. Lukes Healthcare, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Edward Delahunt, in the jurisdiction of Oneida County, NY, . Oneida County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOneida County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 21, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: April 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
April 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 22, 2021 | Affidavit of Additional Mailing | ||
April 22, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 19, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.