Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against Tamara Davis, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County. This case was filed in Niagara County Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure Conference Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 15, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2021 | Hearing |
FCP- Foreclosure Conference
Judge: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part |
|
March 12, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued FCP- Foreclosure Conference Judge: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part |
|
November 14, 2019 | Hearing |
Continued FCP- Foreclosure Conference Judge: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part |
|
October 10, 2019 | Hearing |
Continued FCP- Foreclosure Conference Judge: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part |
|
September 12, 2019 | Hearing |
Continued FCP- Foreclosure Conference Judge: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part |
|
July 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Continued FCP- Foreclosure Conference Judge: Niagara County, Foreclosure Part |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RJI - Affidavidt of Service |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.