Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Barreto, Jonathan Alexander, Sheerin, John J, against Mary E Colbert-Smith, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 23, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 10, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 19, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: December 01, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: January 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Bank Statement |
||
January 10, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 10, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 10, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 01, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING Additioanl Mailing - Mailed 12/01/2021 |
||
November 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 23, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT MARY COLBERT-SMITH |
||
August 23, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.