Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, against Kenneth A. Amico, Marilyn R. Amico, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank A Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank A Sedita Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 12, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
October 12, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
October 07, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
September 27, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 07, 2022 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
September 07, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER (Motion #1) attorney fees |
||
September 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #1) attorney fee provision and time log Redacted per 22 NYCRR attorney fee provision and time log Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.