Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Marshall Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 25, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: July 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 24, 2021AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 25, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 25, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 25, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
April 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
April 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
April 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
April 25, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
April 25, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
April 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
July 27, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING Additional Mailing - Mailed 07/27/2021 |
||
July 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.