Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Debohra Volmy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Lana, Christina Maria, against Justin Blakely Anderson, represented by Sansone, John Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Paula L. Feroleto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula L. Feroleto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2024 |
SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED) *Corrected* Document being processed – check back in 15 minutes |
||
January 30, 2024 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID) | ||
November 01, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 15, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 15, 2021 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 20, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
October 08, 2021 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST | ||
July 22, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 21, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 19, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.