Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Transfer- Structured Sett) case represented by Chaikin, Ianiv Moshe, against Eric Fragale, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Metropolitan Tower Life Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Matthew J. Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew J. Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Transfer- Structured Sett) |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
|
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 07, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
July 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 01, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Letter to court with amended disclosure |
||
June 02, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 10, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
May 07, 2021 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
May 07, 2021 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
May 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D List of Dependents Redacted per 22 NYCRR List of Dependents Redacted |
||
May 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Transfer Agreement |
||
May 07, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Settlement Agreement/Annuity Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.