Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Christina Joyner, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time122 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Clerk stamp |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT nonmil |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
March 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING Mailed 3/21/2017 |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.