Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Matthew Morinello, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time122 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: May 01, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2017 |
JUDGMENT Clerk stamp |
||
May 01, 2017 |
AFFIDAVIT nonmil |
||
May 01, 2017 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
May 01, 2017 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 01, 2017 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
March 21, 2017 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING Mailed 3/21/2017 |
||
January 27, 2017 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 30, 2016 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
December 30, 2016 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.