Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Arrick, Dana Marie, Hughes, Adam M, Hughes, Adam Michael, against Deborah A Boehnke, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions105 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: May 31, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: April 06, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 21, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT INCOME EXEC SATISFIED |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Clerk stamp |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING Mailed 2/28/2017 |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.