Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Hindin, Matthew David, Mitchell, Uwayne Andre, Modica, Tyne Regina, Ragan, Ashley Elizabeth, Wade, Daniel B, (total of 5) See All against Arrow Financial Services, Capital One Bank, Daimler Chrysler Financial Services Americas Llc, John Does And Jane Does, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises,, Joseph J Falcone, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Boniello Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions255 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time255 days |
ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 10, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 26, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2018 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 23, 2018 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
December 06, 2017 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 06, 2017 |
FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM SURPLUS MONIES |
||
November 30, 2017 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 30, 2017 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 06, 2017 |
BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp |
||
August 31, 2017 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
August 31, 2017 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 31, 2017 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.