Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cascino, Margaret Jaffe, Lawrence, Peter Adel, Rogers, Heather C, Weisblatt, Stacey Allyson, against Internal Revenue Service, Martha Logan Estate Of, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, United States Of America, Vivian Logan, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Boniello Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1165 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1165 days |
ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #1)
Date: March 26, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: February 24, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 09, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE (Motion #4) | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE (Motion #4) | |
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #4) Guardian Ad Litem Fee Affidavit |
|
January 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #004)
Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
December 02, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Foreclosure & Sale (Motion #004) Decided: 01/15/2020Granted Before Justice: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #4) ORDER TO AMEND PLEADINGS AND VACATING ORDER OF REFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.