Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Niagara County Department Of Social Services, Rediform Federal Credit Union, Renee Lasker A K A Renee M. Lasker, Renee M Lasker, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time370 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2)
Date: October 17, 2017ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #3)
Date: April 06, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 01, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3)
Date: March 09, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: March 01, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: March 01, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #2)
Date: September 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: August 07, 2017JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2)
Date: August 07, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: August 07, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1)
Date: July 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2017EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: July 05, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #3) | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #3) Adjournment Letter |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) ORDER VACATING JUDGEMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE, CANCELING LIS PENDENS, AND DISCONTINUING ACTION |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) | |
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
|
March 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGEMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND DISCONTINUE ACTION |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #2) Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.