Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Munian, Victoria Elizabeth, against Tammy Martin, Td Auto Finance, Llc, Timothy J. Martin, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Boniello Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions220 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time220 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #4)
Date: October 19, 2017ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4)
Date: November 09, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) signed and granted |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #4) Filed by SJB WOG: 20163431 |
|
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #4) | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS Clerk stamp |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #2) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.