Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Daniel Hanna, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wrona, Michael James, against Jerome N Nowak, John Doe And Jane Doe 1 Through 20, Being Fictitious Names, Intended To Be Tenantsoccupying The Premises Or Some Part Of The Premises, Or May Have Some Type Of Interest In The Premises That Is Subordinate To The Plaintiffs, June M Platt, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Roger J Platt, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions349 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time446 days |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 19, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1)
Date: June 13, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | REPORT OF SALE (SURPLUS MONIES) -APPOINTED REFEREE | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT BILL OF COSTS/CLERK STAMP |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2) | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #2) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.