Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Committee To Elect Maziarz State Senate, George Maziarz, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Roberts, Donald Charles, Szanyi, Kevin A., against Laureen Jacobs, New York State Board Of Elections Necessary Party, represented by Connors, Terrence M., Romano, Nicholas Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2016 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time589 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #2)
Date: December 19, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: December 15, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 30, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2018 | Hearing |
Furlong (Court Activity)
Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
January 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Reassignment Montour (Court Activity) Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
January 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted Furlong (Court Activity) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) Si9gned Order & Judgment |
|
December 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided Montour (Court Activity) Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #2) Notice of Entry to Dkt. 39 |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry for Dkt. 39 |
|
December 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
December 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #002) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.