Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
M&T Bank,, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Case, David P, Ruuska, Ryan E, against City Of Lockport, Estate Of Anne Shisler, Kenneth Shisler Jr. As Heir To The Estate Of Anne Shisler, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 24, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions509 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time509 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: December 23, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: September 05, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 13, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RETURN OF EVICTION-NIAGARA COUNTY SHERIFF |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4) | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) Referee's Report of Sale |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) Notice to Vacate along with the Notice to Vacate Affidavits of Service |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Notice to Quit along with Notice to Quit Affidavits of Service |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #4) Affirmation of Non-Military Service |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #4) Order for Writ of Assistance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.