Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Countryplace Mortgage, Ltd., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Laurilliard, Kevin, against Daniel B Gray, John Doe, Mary Roe, Selviana Verhoeven, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time188 days |
ORDER - SEIZURE (Motion #1)
Date: June 27, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1)
Date: October 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - SEIZURE (Motion #1) | |
March 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided Caruso (Court Activity) Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
March 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
March 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #001)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #1) Proposed Order of Seizure effective April 30, 2017 |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavits of Service for Gray and Verhoeven |
|
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Signed |
|
September 26, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 03/30/2017Granted Before Justice: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK Answer demanded: No Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
September 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
September 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.