Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carrington Mortgage Services, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Kosterich, Jeffrey, against John Doe Numbers 1-10 The Names Of These Defendants Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intented Being The Tentants, Occupants, Person Or Corporations, If Any Having Or Claiming An Interest In, Possession Of, Or Lien Upon The Premises, Nikki M. Morreale, Thomas H. Kresman Ii, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure Conference Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time112 days |
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 06, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 07, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 06, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2017 | Hearing |
Discontinued
Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Attorney Affirmation Included |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Attorney Affirmation Included |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION OCA Affirmation and OCA Affidavit |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Affirmation for Settlement Conference | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service by mail/nikki m. morreale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.