Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union -Od, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Ilecki, William, against Brandilynn Ludlam, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Richard C. Kloch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard C. Kloch Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions113 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time113 days |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 29, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: January 03, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXECUTION Cortland Co Sheriff |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
December 27, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) | |
December 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided Kloch (Court Activity) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
December 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
December 12, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 12/27/2016Decided Before Justice: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. Answer demanded: No Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
December 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.