Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Munian, Victoria Elizabeth, against David M Macneil, David N Macneil A K A David M. Macneil, First Niagara Bank Na, Julie A Macneil, represented by Gaines, Kathleen Elizabeth, Ruuska, Ryan E, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure Conference Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time601 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
March 22, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided Furlong (Court Activity) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
March 21, 2018 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #001) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
March 07, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 03/22/2018Decided Before Justice: Furlong, Hon. Daniel Answer demanded: No Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
March 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
November 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Furlong (Settlement Conference)
Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
October 12, 2017 | Hearing |
Furlong (Settlement Conference)
Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
September 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Reassignment Conference Part (Court Activity) Judge: Conference Part (FCP), Foreclosure |
|
September 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Case Not Settled
Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
August 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Continued
Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.