Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Telecor, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Schaeffer, Dennis Kieren, against Point Monitor Corporation, represented by Dwyer, Benjamin Ryan, Smith, Sheldon Keith, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 28, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time197 days |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 06, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 10, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 16, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: July 28, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | |
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | |
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.