Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
First Niagara Bank, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Jacobson, Robert L, against Niagara County, New York, The Assessor Of The Town Of Pendleton, The Town Of Pendleton, Town Of Pendleton Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Lisowski, Gary Henry, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Henry Nowak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry Nowak Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
PETITION
Date: July 26, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 26, 2016ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #002)
Date: October 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
September 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY 20-045NJ |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES Redacted Income and Expense |
|
December 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Court Attorney Referee Hayden Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
December 04, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned Court Attorney Referee Hayden Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
May 08, 2019 | Hearing |
Court Attorney Referee Hayden
Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #002) to intervene |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.