Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, First National Of Nebraska Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Robert J Ratajczak, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Boniello Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions864 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time912 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: October 04, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 28, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: October 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A military status |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #1) signed |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.