Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of New York, Bank Of New York Mellon F K A The Bank Of New York, Successor To Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., As Trustee For Centex Home Equity Loan Trust 2005-D, Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, against A. Angelo Dimillo, Administrator Niagara County Chief Fiscal Officer, Niagara County Chief Fiscal Officer As Administrator For The Estate Of Howard R. Gardner, Howard R. Gardner'S Respective Heirs-At-Law, Next-Of-Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Devisees, Legatees, Assignees, Lienors, Creditors, And Successors In Interest, Amanda Gardner, Amanda R Gardner A K A Amanda Gardner, Dicksie Daugherty, (total of 14) See All represented by Andrews, Kyle R, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Boniello Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions627 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time620 days |
Administrator Niagara County Chief Fiscal Officer, Niagara County Chief Fiscal Officer As Administrator For The Estate Of Howard R. Gardner, Howard R. Gardner'S Respective Heirs-At-Law, Next-Of-Kin, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Trustees, Devisees, Legatees, Assignees, Lienors, Creditors, And Successors In Interest
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 10, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 08, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
June 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #004) Boniello, III (Motion Part) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #4) signed |
|
May 31, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #004) Decided: 06/05/2018Decided Before Justice: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
May 31, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #004) Boniello, III (Motion Part) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #4) Substitute Referee |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Including Exhibits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.