Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ridgeview At Lewiston, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Weinmann, Peter Allen, against County Of Niagara, Town Of Lewiston, represented by Catalano, A. Joseph, Lisowski, Gary Henry, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Henry Nowak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry Nowak Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 20, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1154 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 26, 2019NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001)
Date: July 20, 2016ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #002)
Date: September 29, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER CONSENT |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
September 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled
Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
August 09, 2019 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
July 12, 2019 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
June 21, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
April 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Court Attorney Referee Hayden Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
March 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Court Attorney Referee Hayden Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
November 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Court Attorney Referee Hayden Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.