Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jesse C Ochterski, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Brown, Luke Anthony, against Tim Donut, represented by Norfleet, Kristin Lewis, Schoenborn, Sean Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Sara Sheldon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSara Sheldon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 01, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 24, 2017ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Correspondence |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Good Faith Correspondence |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Discovery Demands |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint |
|
July 06, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.