Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Metal Cladding, Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Glynn, Eric Thomas, Mc Namara, Mark Ryan, against City Of Lockport Assessor, City Of Lockport Board Of Assessment Review, City Of Lockport, New York, County Of Niagara, represented by Lisowski, Gary Henry, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management38 days |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 13, 2017NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #0)
Date: July 15, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation and Order of Settlement |
|
March 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
March 07, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 03/13/2017Decided Before Justice: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK Answer demanded: No Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
March 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
March 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Richardson (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
March 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled Caruso (Court Activity) Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | |
October 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) | |
September 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Richardson (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.