Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
David Sanchez, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Freid, Wayne Irwin, against Shane Parker, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 14, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Breach Of Lease) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions183 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time187 days |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: October 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Five Day Notice | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Five Day Notice |
|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS WITH NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.