Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, Ortiona, Rosemary Spring, against Bonnie Baudendistle, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time636 days |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: September 27, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 14, 2016SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT sea#193559 |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT INCOME EXEC SATISFIED |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Clerk stamp |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING mailed 09/19/2017 |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT SEA # 193559 |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION SEA # 193559 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.