Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
621 Payne Avenue Llc And All Other Petitioners As Set Forth Herein, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Litt, Robert Gordon, against County Of Niagara, The Board Of Assessors And Or The Assessor Of The City Of North Tonawanda And The Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Lisowski, Gary Henry, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management113 days |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Case Cycle Time204 days |
PETITION
Date: July 13, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 21, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 07, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled Caruso (Court Activity) Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
January 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Richardson (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
December 02, 2016 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance of S. Sharkey, Esq. |
||
November 21, 2016 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 07, 2016 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
November 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Caruso (Prelim. Conference) Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
November 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
November 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #001)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
October 04, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 11/03/2016Decided Before Justice: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK Answer demanded: No Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
October 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.