Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lauren Christine Rick, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Anthony Thomas Rick Iii, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Frank A Sedita presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank A Sedita Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 04, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 04, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #3) | ||
February 25, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
February 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
February 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 25, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 19, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
October 07, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
October 07, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.