Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kenneth E. Guthrie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fanizzi, Andrew David, against Andrea M. Stoddard, Antoine A. Debold, Geico General Insurance Company, represented by Schulz, Marc A., in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time688 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 09, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 25, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2017 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 25, 2016 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
January 29, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on defendant, Debold |
||
January 18, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on defendant, GEICO |
||
January 07, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on defendant, Stoddard |
||
December 22, 2015 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.