Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Anna Choops As Administrator Of The Estate Of Larry M. Choops, Anna Choops Individually, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bauman, Dale James, Stuermer, Michael Paul, against Laura E. Howard-Raska A K A Laura E Howard, Michael D. Donnelly, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management417 days |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time509 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 31, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 01, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 01, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 31, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 10, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2015NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: March 28, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 01, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 02, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 11, 2016ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: March 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2016RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 12, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 03, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 31, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 31, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 31, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 31, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 31, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 31, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 28, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2017 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled Furlong (Court Activity) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
May 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
May 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #003) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
April 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
April 03, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 05/10/2017Decided Before Justice: Furlong, Hon. Daniel Answer demanded: No Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
March 28, 2017 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
March 28, 2017 | NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
March 28, 2017 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A A - Disbursements |
||
March 28, 2017 |
AFFIDAVIT Michael P. Stuermer Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.