Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brenda Drayton, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Grossman, Mark Donald, against Abc And Xyz, Bg Lockport, Llc, Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, Burlington Coat Factory Of New York, Llc, Burlington Coat Factory Realty Of Yonkers, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Briandi, Jody Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A Boniello presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Boniello Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Fall Down) |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2016ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: November 17, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: August 10, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Signed |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Signed |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) Signed |
|
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) correspondence |
|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.