Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rmc & Wl Transit Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Weinmann, Peter Allen, against Town Of Lockport, represented by Norris, Michael Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2015 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time553 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 10, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 06, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)
Date: July 16, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Signed Consent Order |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
January 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
January 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled Furlong (Court Activity) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
January 18, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Montour (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
January 03, 2017 | Hearing |
Reassignment Montour (Court Activity) Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
November 17, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Montour (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
November 23, 2015 | Hearing |
Held Montour (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Montour, Hon. Mark A. |
|
October 14, 2015 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #001) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.