Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
6015, 6017, And 6041 S. Transit Road, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Weinmann, Peter Allen, against Town Of Lockport, represented by Norris, Michael Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Henry Nowak presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry Nowak Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 16, 2015 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1106 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 30, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 09, 2017NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: July 16, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided Nowak (Court Activity) Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER consent-settlement |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
July 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Reassignment Walker (Court Activity) Judge: Walker, Hon. Timothy J. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 07/26/2018Closed Before Justice: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Nowak (Motion Part) Judge: Nowak, Hon. Henry J. |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.