Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wayne Deane, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Shemik, Nicholas James, against Benderson Development Company, Llc, Erie Canal Harbor Development Corporation, Harbor District Associates, Llc, represented by D'Aquino, Albert John, Hunter, Daniel Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Richard C. Kloch presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard C. Kloch Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management179 days |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time307 days |
ANSWER
Date: September 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 08, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
May 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled Kloch (Court Activity) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
May 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Kloch (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2) | |
March 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #001) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
March 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
March 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #002) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
March 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
March 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Winter (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
March 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.