Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., Wallace, Lisa L, against Christian Rzucidlo, John Doe #1 To John Doe #10, The Last 10 Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint,, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Ralph A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph A Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time645 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 03, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | |
March 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled - Loan Modification Boniello, III (Settlement Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 09, 2017 | Hearing |
Continued Boniello, III (Settlement Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
January 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Continued Boniello, III (Settlement Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
December 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Continued Boniello, III (Settlement Conference) Judge: Miscellaneous Judge, Hon. Code |
|
September 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Continued Boniello, III (Settlement Conference) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
|
August 11, 2016 | Hearing |
Continued Boniello, III (Settlement Conference) Judge: Boniello III, Hon. Ralph A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.