Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., Wallace, Lisa L, against City Of Lockport New York, A Municipal Corporation, Dawn Weber A K A Dawn M. Weber, Gregory Weber, Krista Mt Pleasant, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure Conference Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions482 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time546 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 17, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: June 10, 2016JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2)
Date: October 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM Terms of Sale and Memorandum of Sale |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Report of Sale, Statement, and Receipt |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
August 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
August 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) Appointing Successor Referee |
|
June 01, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 08/14/2017Decided Before Justice: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK Answer demanded: No Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
|
June 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003)
Judge: CARUSO, Hon. FRANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.