Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bussi, Nicholas C., Fourtner, Tracy Mckay, Hilton Iii, Andrew C, Hyman, Sarah Kristin, Jurek, Amber Augustine, (total of 5) See All against Elfi G Henry Individually And As Surviving Spouse Of William M. Henry, Eric Henry, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Foreclosure Conference Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeForeclosure Conference Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions552 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time552 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: April 06, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 13, 2015ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3)
Date: May 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) | |
May 08, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
May 03, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
April 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #003) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Proposed Order |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Notice of Motion to Extend Sale Date |
|
April 06, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 05/08/2017Decided Before Justice: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. Answer demanded: No Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
April 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) Kloch (Motion Part) Judge: Kloch, Hon. Richard C. |
|
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #3) Affirmation in Support of Motion to Extend Sale Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.