Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Investors Bank F K A Investors Savings Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Akarah, Amanie, Bussi, Nicholas C., Fay, Richard Patrick, Fourtner, Tracy Mckay, Heaney, Alexandra Rose, (total of 12) See All against Charles P. Preti, John Doe, People Of The State Of New York, Santander Bank, N.A. Formerly Known As Sovereign Bank, N.A. Formerly Known As Sovereign Bank, Zabeeda Preti, (total of 5) See All represented by Quinn, Kevin Michael, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Daniel J Furlong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel J Furlong Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1169 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1169 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2)
Date: May 25, 2018ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #1)
Date: September 01, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS clerk stamped |
|
September 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
September 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Rescheduled (Motion #003) Furlong (Motion Part) Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
September 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Furlong (Court Activity)
Judge: Furlong, Hon. Daniel |
|
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
September 05, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.