Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
James William Storey, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Smith, Edward Leo, against Christopher A. Camizzi, represented by Palmerton, Nicole B., in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 18, 2013STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 26, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: February 11, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Dismiss |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Aff of Service of Summons & Complaint |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answer |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Summons & Complaint |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service for mailing motion to pc |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
January 02, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.