Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Citimortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by May, Ted E, Rogers, Heather C, against Cach, Llc, Capital One Bank, Courtney J. Hillman, John Doe, Kevin M. Gibson, (total of 11) See All represented by Walls, Michele M, in the jurisdiction of Niagara County, NY, . Niagara County, NY Superior Courts Niagara County Supreme Court with Frank Caruso presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrank Caruso Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions789 days |
Filing LocationNiagara County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseNiagara County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time790 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)
Date: September 28, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 12, 2013SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 12, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT - COURT APPOINTED | |
June 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION AFID PUB NIAGARA GAZETTE 5/31 SALE |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE Sale set for 4/20/2016 |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) JFS |
|
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING statement of auth |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.